Former Directors
No.
Name
Tenure
1
Fr. Steny Jebamalai S.J
June - 1984 To July 1987
2
Fr. John Muthappan S.J
Aug - 1987 To 26-4-1991
3
Fr. Antony Shankurikal S.J
27-4-1991 To 28-4-1994
4
Fr. Vallerian Dias S.J
29-4-1994 To 01-06-2005
5
Fr. Henry D'Souza S.J
1-6-2004 To 01-06-2005
6
Fr. Steny Pinto S.J
3-6-2005 To 2-06-2018
7
Fr. Sobers Dikunha S.J
3-6-2018 To 2-06-2019
8
Fr. Royston Fernandes S.J
1-9-2019 To 1-06-2021
9
Fr. Rony Saldahna S.J
2-6-2021 To 3-06-2022
10
Fr. Robert Mascarenhas S.J
3-6-2022 To Present