Principals
No.
Name
Tenure
1
Fr. Maria Joseph Prakasham S.J
4-7-1086 To 30-6-1996
2
Fr. Royston Fernandes S.J
1-7-1996 To 11-6-1998
3
Fr. Paul Vallapila S.J
12-6-1998 To 31-3-1999
4
Fr. Kurikkattil Cosmos S.J
8-4-1999 To 08-06-2004
5
Fr. James Savarimuthu S.J
9-6-2004 To 19-11-2009
6
Fr. Anil Parmar S.J
20-11-2009 To 23-07-2010
7
Fr. Sudhir Bhatiya S.J
27-10-2010 To 4-06-2015
8
Fr. Antony Cruz Arul S.J
5-6-2015 To 1-11-2019
9
Fr. Nixon A Macwan S.J
15-11-2019 To Present